VA HJR581 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Passed on February 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-22 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ581ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Passed on February 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-22 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ581ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Interstate 95 Corridor Improvement Plan; report. Requests the Commonwealth Transportation Board to study the portion of the Interstate 95 corridor between Exit 118 and the Springfield Interchange, financing options for improvements to the corridor, and the effect that enhanced transit service would have on mitigating traffic along the corridor.
Title
Interstate 95 Corridor Improvement Plan; Commonwealth Transportation Board to study.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Substitute by Senator reconsidered (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 7-N) (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Substitute by Senator Peake rejected 19107425D-S1 (10-Y 29-N) (Y: 10 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Amendment #2 by Senator Surovell reconsidered (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Substitute by Senator Peake agreed to 19107425D-S1 (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 7-N) (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Substitute by Senator Peake rejected 19107425D-S1 (10-Y 29-N) (Y: 10 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Amendment #2 by Senator Surovell reconsidered (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Substitute by Senator Peake agreed to 19107425D-S1 (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ581ER) |
2019-02-21 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 7-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (90-Y 7-N) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate with amendment by voice vote |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Amendment #1 by Senator Surovell agreed to |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Peake rejected 19107425D-S1 (10-Y 29-N) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Peake reconsidered (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Amendment #2 by Senator Surovell rejected |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Amendment #2 by Senator Surovell reconsidered (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Amendment #2 by Senator Surovell agreed to |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Amendment #1 by Senator Surovell withdrawn |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Peake agreed to 19107425D-S1 (22-Y 18-N) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 19107425D-S1 (Peake) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Reading waived |
2019-02-04 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House |
2019-02-04 | House | Taken up |
2019-01-31 | House | Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-17 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-08-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-08-14 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100237D |