VA HJR577 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-21 - Senate: Left in Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-21 - Senate: Left in Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Memorializes Congress to recognize the importance of unfettered access to the Internet. Urges Congress to limit the Federal Communications Commission's authority over regulation of the Internet.
Title
Internet; urging Congress to recognize importance of unfettered access and limit regulation by FCC.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (63-Y 33-N 3-A) (Y: 65 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-21 | Senate: Left in Rules | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Reading waived | |
2011-01-31 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (63-Y 33-N 3-A) | |
2011-01-31 | House: Agreed to by House (63-Y 33-N 3-A) | |
2011-01-31 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2011-01-31 | House: Pending question ordered | |
2011-01-31 | House: Taken up | |
2011-01-28 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2011-01-25 | House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2011-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103326D |