VA HJR57 | 2018 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 12 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-01-18 - Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]


Commending Philip Alan Broadfoot.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Commending Philip Alan Broadfoot.



2018-01-18SenateAgreed to by Senate by voice vote
2018-01-15SenateLaid on Clerk's Desk
2018-01-12HouseAgreed to by House by voice vote
2018-01-12HouseEngrossed by House
2018-01-06HousePrefiled and laid on Speaker's table; offered 01/10/18 18101152D

Virginia State Sources

Bill Comments