VA HJR569 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Forestry; stakeholder advisory group to study and evaluate enabling statutes for local ordinances related to the preservation, planting, and replacement of trees during the land development process; report. Requests the Department of Forestry to convene a stakeholder advisory group for the purposes of studying and evaluating Virginia's current enabling statutes for local ordinances related to the preservation, planting, and replacement of trees during the land development process.
Title
Trees; Dept. of Forestry to study & evaluate enabling statutes for ordinances related to planting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | House | Left in Rules |
2021-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-20 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2021-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2021-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102114D |