VA HJR564 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Constitutional amendment (first resolution); General Assembly powers; limitations. Provides that the General Assembly may suspend or nullify any or all portions of any administrative rule or regulation by joint resolution agreed to by a majority of the members elected to each house. The General Assembly may designate a joint legislative commission or pair of standing committees representing both houses to suspend any administrative rule or regulation during the interim when the General Assembly is not in a regular session.
Title
Constitutional amendment; powers of General Assembly, limitations (first reference).
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Head [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2013-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HJ537-Habeeb) by voice vote |
2013-01-11 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Constitutional Amendments Subcommittee |
2012-12-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2012-12-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13100534D |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+sum+HJ564 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HJ564+hil |