VA HJR555 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous HJR555

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0516)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Constitutional amendment (first reference); qualifications of voters and the right to vote; persons not entitled to vote. Provides that every person who meets the qualifications of voters set forth in the Constitution shall have the fundament right to vote in the Commonwealth and that such right shall not be abridged by law, except for persons who have been convicted of a felony and persons who have been adjudicated to lack the capacity to understand the act of voting. A person who has been convicted of a felony shall not be entitled to vote during any period of incarceration for such felony conviction, but upon release from incarceration for that felony conviction and without further action required of him, he shall be invested with all political rights, including the right to vote. A person who has been adjudicated to lack the capacity to understand the act of voting shall not be entitled to vote during this period of incapacity until his capacity has been reestablished as prescribed by law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Constitutional amendment; qualifications of voters and the right to vote (first reference).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: Agreed To (56-Y 40-N) (Y: 56 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Senate requested second conference committee (23-Y 16-N) (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Conference report rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (35-Y 4-N) (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (2-Y 93-N) (Y: 2 N: 93 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Agreed to by Senate with substitute (20-Y 16-N) (Y: 20 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (58-Y 41-N) (Y: 58 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-31 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0516)
2021-03-31HouseAssigned Chapter 516 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-03-09HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HJ555ER)
2021-03-09HouseEnrolled
2021-02-27HouseVOTE: Agreed To (56-Y 40-N)
2021-02-27HouseConference report agreed to by House (56-Y 40-N)
2021-02-27HouseSecond Conference substitute printed 21200807D-H3
2021-02-27SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (21-Y 18-N)
2021-02-27SenateSenators: Locke, Surovell, Vogel
2021-02-27SenateSecond conferees appointed by Senate
2021-02-27HouseDelegates: Herring, Simon, Avoli
2021-02-27HouseSecond conferees appointed by House
2021-02-27HouseHouse acceded to request for second conference committee
2021-02-27SenateSenate requested second conference committee (23-Y 16-N)
2021-02-27SenateConference report rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N)
2021-02-27HouseConference substitute printed 21200745D-H2
2021-02-27 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2021-02-25SenateSenators: Locke, Surovell, Vogel
2021-02-25SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2021-02-25HouseDelegates: Herring, Simon, Avoli
2021-02-25HouseConferees appointed by House
2021-02-25HouseHouse acceded to request
2021-02-24SenateSenate requested conference committee
2021-02-24SenateSenate insisted on substitute (35-Y 4-N)
2021-02-23HouseVOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 93-N)
2021-02-23HouseSenate substitute rejected by House 21200032D-S1 (2-Y 93-N)
2021-02-23HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-19SenateAgreed to by Senate with substitute (20-Y 16-N)
2021-02-19SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HJ555S1
2021-02-19SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 21200032D-S1
2021-02-19SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-02-19SenateRead third time
2021-02-18SenateRead second time
2021-02-16SenateCommittee substitute printed 21200032D-S1
2021-02-16SenateReported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (9-Y 6-N)
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2021-02-05SenateReading waived
2021-02-04HouseVOTE: Agree To (58-Y 41-N)
2021-02-04HouseAgreed to by House (58-Y 41-N)
2021-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HJ555H1
2021-02-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21104281D-H1
2021-02-04HouseTaken up
2021-02-03HouseIncorporates HJ546 (Jones)
2021-02-03HouseCommittee substitute printed 21104281D-H1
2021-02-03HouseReported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (13-Y 9-N)
2021-02-01HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 2-N)
2021-01-14HouseAssigned P & E sub: Constitutional Amendments
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2021-01-12HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102197D

Same As/Similar To

HJ546 (Similar To)
HJ546 (Similar To)
HJR555 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
SJ272 (Same As) 2021-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0519)
SJ272 (Same As) 2021-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0519)

Subjects


Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+HJ555
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HJ555+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HJ555H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HJ555S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HJ555H2+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HJ555H3+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HJ555ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0516+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21200032D.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+HJ555AC
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+HJ555ACR
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H1802C0002+HJ0555
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H18C0035+HJ0555
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC1462+HJ0555
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S08C0072+HJ0555
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S08V0004+HJ0555
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0229HJ0555+HJ0555
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV1896+HJ0555
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0410HJ0555+HJ0555
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0548HJ0555+HJ0555
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0549HJ0555+HJ0555
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0577HJ0555+HJ0555
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV2044+HJ0555

Bill Comments

feedback