VA HJR555 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HJR555
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Constitutional amendment (first reference); franchise and officers; felon disenfranchisement; automatic restoration of political rights. Provides that no person who has been convicted of a felony shall be qualified to vote until the completion of his sentence of imprisonment, at which time, without further action required of him, his political rights, including the right to vote, shall be restored. A person convicted of a felony may also have his civil rights restored by the Governor or other appropriate authority.
Title
Constitutional amendment; felon disenfranchisement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (58-Y 41-N) (Y: 58 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (58-Y 41-N) (Y: 58 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Reading waived |
2021-02-04 | House | VOTE: Agree To (58-Y 41-N) |
2021-02-04 | House | Agreed to by House (58-Y 41-N) |
2021-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HJ555H1 |
2021-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 21104281D-H1 |
2021-02-04 | House | Taken up |
2021-02-03 | House | Incorporates HJ546 (Jones) |
2021-02-03 | House | Committee substitute printed 21104281D-H1 |
2021-02-03 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (13-Y 9-N) |
2021-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 2-N) |
2021-01-14 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Constitutional Amendments |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2021-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102197D |
Same As/Similar To
HJR555 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
HJ546 (Similar To) 2021-02-03 - Incorporated by Privileges and Elections
HJ546 (Similar To) 2021-02-03 - Incorporated by Privileges and Elections
HJ546 (Similar To) 2021-02-03 - Incorporated by Privileges and Elections
HJ546 (Similar To) 2021-02-03 - Incorporated by Privileges and Elections