VA HJR55 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; continuing the Joint Subcommittee on Recurrent Flooding; report. Continues the Joint Subcommittee on Recurrent Flooding for two additional years, through the 2025 interim.
Title
Recurrent Flooding, Joint Subcommittee on; study continued.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Rules |
2024-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-25 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies Subcommittee |
2024-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2024-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24102415D |