VA HJR535 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ535ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ535ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Helen Montague Foster, M.D.
Title
Commending Helen Montague Foster, M.D.
Sponsors
Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. James Massie [R] | Del. John O'Bannon [R] | Del. Lee Ware [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ535ER) |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Received |
2016-03-09 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2016-03-09 | House | Engrossed by House |
2016-03-07 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 16106033D |