VA HJR500 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-10 - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (76-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-10 - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (76-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Dr. Thomas G. Digges, Jr.
Title
Commending Dr. Thomas G. Digges, Jr.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (76-Y 0-N) (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 24 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-10 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (76-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-09 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ500ER) | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2012-03-07 | Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk | |
2012-03-07 | Senate: Received | |
2012-03-06 | House: Agreed to by House by voice vote | |
2012-03-06 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2012-03-05 | House: Introduced bill reprinted 12105058D | |
2012-03-02 | House: Presented and laid on Speaker's table 12105058D |