VA HJR39 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-08 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ39ER)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-08 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ39ER)
Summary
Commending the Eastern Shore Chapter of the Colonial Dames XVII Century on the occasion of its 40th anniversary.
Title
Commending the Eastern Shore Chapter of the Colonial Dames XVII Century on the occasion of its 40th.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-08 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ39ER) | |
2008-01-17 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2008-01-14 | Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk | |
2008-01-14 | Senate: Received | |
2008-01-11 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-01-11 | House: Agreed to by House by voice vote | |
2008-01-11 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2008-01-08 | House: Introduced bill reprinted 088236596 | |
2007-12-20 | House: Prefiled and laid on Speaker's table; offered 01/09/08 088236596 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HJ39 |