VA HJR362 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-24 - Senate: Continued to 2013 in Rules by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-24 - Senate: Continued to 2013 in Rules by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Commending CACI International Inc.
Title
Commending CACI International Inc. on the occasion of its 50th anniversary.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-24 | Senate: Continued to 2013 in Rules by voice vote | |
2012-02-20 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2012-02-20 | Senate: Reading waived | |
2012-02-17 | House: Agreed to by House by voice vote | |
2012-02-17 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2012-02-13 | House: Introduced bill reprinted 12105005D | |
2012-02-10 | House: Presented and laid on Speaker's table 12105005D |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+sum+HJ362 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+HJ362+hil |