VA HJR332 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-09 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ332ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-09 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ332ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the 200th anniversary of Capitol Square.
Title
Commending Capitol Square.
Sponsors
Del. Kirkland Cox [R] | Sen. Lashrecse Aird [D] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Riley Ingram [R] |
Del. Steven Landes [R] | Del. George Loupassi [R] | Del. Christopher Peace [R] | Del. Lee Ware [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-09 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ332ER) |
2016-03-09 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-09 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 16106121D-S1 (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate with substitute by voice vote |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HJ332S1 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 16106121D-S1 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 16106121D-S1 |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Reading waived |
2016-02-26 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2016-02-26 | House | Engrossed by House |
2016-02-22 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 16103960D |