VA HJR32 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Joint Commission on Technology and Science; semiconductor industry expansion; report. Directs the Joint Commission on Technology and Science to study the challenges and opportunities to expand the semiconductor industry in the Commonwealth. The Commission shall submit its findings no later than the first day of the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
Title
Semiconductor industry; Jt. Commission on Technology & Science to study expansion in Commonwealth.
Sponsors
Sen. Suhas Subramanyam [D] | Del. Nadarius Clark [D] | Del. Glenn Davis [R] | Del. Michelle Maldonado [D] |
Del. Irene Shin [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2022-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-04 | House | Assigned App. sub: General Government and Capital Outlay |
2022-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-03 | House | Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103665D |
Subjects
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Trade and Commerce
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Trade and Commerce