VA HJR30 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ30ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ30ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; State Corporation Commission; electric utilities; performance-based regulatory tools; competitive service providers; report. Requests the State Corporation Commission, in consultation with the Department of Energy, to study performance-based regulatory tools for investor-owned electric utilities and the impact of competitive service providers in the Commonwealth. Study; State Corporation Commission; electric utilities; performance-based regulatory tools; competitive service providers; report. Requests the State Corporation Commission, in consultation with the Department of Energy, to study performance-based regulatory tools for investor-owned electric utilities and the impact of competitive service providers in the Commonwealth.
Title
Investor-owned electric utilities; SCC to study performance-based regulatory tools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: Block vote adoption (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: Block vote adoption (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ30ER) |
2024-03-06 | House | VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-06 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 24108526D-S1 (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-06 | House | Taken up |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate with substitute by voice vote |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HJ30S1 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 24108526D-S1 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24108526D-S1 |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Reading waived |
2024-02-12 | House | VOTE: Block vote adoption (97-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-12 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HJ30H1 |
2024-02-12 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24106412D-H1 |
2024-02-12 | House | Taken up |
2024-02-07 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-01 | House | Assigned App. sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2024-02-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-02-01 | House | Committee substitute printed 24106412D-H1 |
2024-02-01 | House | Reported from Rules with substitute (18-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-25 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24104714D |
Same As/Similar To
SJR47 (Similar To) 2024-03-05 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ47ER)