VA HJR298 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ298ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ298ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of Steven Lamarr Hixon.
Title
Celebrating the life of Steven Lamarr Hixon.
Sponsors
Sen. Lamont Bagby [D] | Del. Dawn Adams [D] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Delores McQuinn [D] |
Sen. Schuyler VanValkenburg [D] | Del. Rodney Willett [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ298ER) |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Received |
2022-03-07 | House | Agreed to by House |
2022-03-07 | House | Engrossed by House |
2022-02-24 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 22105484D |