VA HJR288 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on February 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-10 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ288ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on February 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-10 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ288ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the McLean Project for the Arts on it's 50th anniversary.
Title
Commending the McLean Project for the Arts on its 50th anniversary.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-10 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ288ER) | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2012-02-06 | Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk | |
2012-02-06 | Senate: Received | |
2012-02-03 | House: Agreed to by House by voice vote | |
2012-02-03 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2012-01-31 | House: Introduced bill reprinted 12103365D | |
2012-01-30 | House: Presented and laid on Speaker's table 12103365D |