VA HJR275 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ275ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ275ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Frances Carter Ragland.
Title
Commending Frances Carter Ragland.
Sponsors
Del. Lee Ware [R] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ275ER) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Received |
2018-02-23 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2018-02-23 | House | Engrossed by House |
2018-02-14 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 18106995D |