VA HJR264 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-01 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ264ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-01 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ264ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Jane Garrant Roane.
Title
Commending Jane Garrant Roane.
Sponsors
Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. George Loupassi [R] | Sen. Jennifer McClellan [D] | Del. Delores McQuinn [D] |
Sen. Joseph Morrissey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-01 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ264ER) | |
2010-02-25 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Received | |
2010-02-19 | House: Agreed to by House by voice vote | |
2010-02-19 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2010-02-15 | House: Introduced bill reprinted 10105003D | |
2010-02-11 | House: Presented and laid on Speaker's table 10105003D |