VA HJR250 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-19 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ250ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-19 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ250ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of Carl Joseph Koenig, Sr.
Title
Celebrating the life of Carl Joseph Koenig, Sr.
Sponsors
Del. William Janis [R] | Del. George Loupassi [R] | Del. James Massie [R] | Del. John O'Bannon [R] |
Del. Christopher Peace [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-19 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ250ER) | |
2010-02-18 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Received | |
2010-02-12 | House: Agreed to by House | |
2010-02-12 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2010-02-10 | House: Introduced bill reprinted 10104445D | |
2010-02-09 | House: Presented and laid on Speaker's table 10104445D |