CA AB1533 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 353, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 353, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 38592.1 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend Sections 25106, 25207, 25213, 25217.1, 25217.5, 25222, 25224, 25305.5, 25320, 25402, 25402.1, 25402.7, 25402.11, 25403.8, 25405.5, 25519, 25555, 25601, 25605, 25806, 25901, 25953, and 25991.1 of, to repeal Sections 25227, 25228, 25302.2, 25401.6, 25402.6, 25486, 25603.5, and 25805 of, and to repeal Chapter 5.1 (commencing with Section 25406) of, Chapter 7.7 (commencing with Section 25678) of, and Chapter 7.9 (commencing with Section 25695) of, Division 15 of, the Public Resources Code, to amend Sections 454.53 and 910.4 of, and to add Sections 913.11 and 913.17 to, the Public Utilities Code, and to amend Section 80730 of the Water Code, relating to electricity.
Title
Electricity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1533 Utilities and Energy Concurrence in Senate Amendments By PETRIE-NORRIS (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-08-30 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1533 U. & E. (Petrie-Norris) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-07-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1533 Utilities and Energy Third Reading Urgency By GARCIA (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-08-30 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1533 U. & E. (Petrie-Norris) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-07-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1533 Utilities and Energy Third Reading Urgency By GARCIA (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 353, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-09-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-09-12 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2024-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0.). |
2024-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2024-08-29 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2024-08-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2024-08-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 17 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2024-08-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5081.). |
2024-08-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-08-05 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-07-31 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-07-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-07-02 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (July 2). |
2024-06-10 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2023-07-03 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 2123.). |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1743.) |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 17). |
2023-05-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2023-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 26). |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2023-04-13 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-27 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2023-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |