VA HJR229 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-24 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ229ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-24 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ229ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the Cape Henry Collegiate boys' basketball team.
Title
Commending the Cape Henry Collegiate boys' basketball team.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ229ER) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Received |
2022-02-21 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2022-02-21 | House | Engrossed by House |
2022-02-16 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 22104984D |