VA HJR227 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-24 - Senate: Continued to 2013 in Rules by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-24 - Senate: Continued to 2013 in Rules by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Memorializing the President of the United States and the Congress of the United States to adopt a national energy policy. Expresses the sense of the General Assembly that the President and the Congress adopt a national energy policy that supports the responsible exploration for and development of all of this nation's diverse energy resources in order to secure abundant supplies of affordable, reliable energy for our economic recovery and future prosperity.
Title
National energy policy; urging President of U.S. and Congress of U.S. to adopt.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (65-Y 30-N) (Y: 67 N: 30 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Rules (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Rules (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-24 | Senate: Continued to 2013 in Rules by voice vote | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Reading waived | |
2012-02-10 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (65-Y 30-N) | |
2012-02-10 | House: Agreed to by House (65-Y 30-N) | |
2012-02-10 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2012-02-10 | House: Taken up | |
2012-02-07 | House: Reported from Rules (10-Y 4-N) | |
2012-01-20 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2012-01-20 | House: Presented and ordered printed 12104213D |