VA HJR225 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-19 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ225ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-19 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ225ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the Virginia Health Care Foundation on its 18 years of service to the Commonwealth as a public-private partnership and its longstanding record of substantially leveraging state dollars to increase access to primary health care for uninsured and medically underserved Virginians.
Title
Commending the Virginia Health Care Foundation on its 18 years of service to the Commonwealth.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-19 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ225ER) | |
2010-02-18 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Received | |
2010-02-12 | House: Agreed to by House by voice vote | |
2010-02-12 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2010-02-03 | House: Introduced bill reprinted 10104095D | |
2010-02-02 | House: Presented and laid on Speaker's table 10104095D |