VA HJR223 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ223ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Celebrating the life of Michael Evan Watkins.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Celebrating the life of Michael Evan Watkins.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-15HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HJ223ER)
2018-02-15SenateAgreed to by Senate
2018-02-12SenateLaid on Clerk's Desk
2018-02-12SenateReceived
2018-02-09HouseAgreed to by House
2018-02-09HouseEngrossed by House
2018-02-06HousePresented and laid on Speaker's table 18104320D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback