VA HJR22 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3)
Status: Passed on January 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-27 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ22ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3)
Status: Passed on January 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-27 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ22ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Tyler Whitley.
Title
Commending Tyler Whitley.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-27 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ22ER) | |
2012-01-26 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Received | |
2012-01-20 | House: Agreed to by House by voice vote | |
2012-01-20 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2012-01-13 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2012-01-11 | House: Introduced bill reprinted 12100057D | |
2012-01-03 | House: Prefiled and laid on Speaker's table; offered 01/11/12 12100057D |