VA HJR215 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-27 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ215ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-27 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ215ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of the Honorable A. Lee McGratty.
Title
Celebrating the life of the Honorable A. Lee McGratty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-27 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ215ER) | |
2012-01-26 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Received | |
2012-01-20 | House: Agreed to by House | |
2012-01-20 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2012-01-19 | House: Introduced bill reprinted 12100137D | |
2012-01-18 | House: Presented and laid on Speaker's table 12100137D |