VA HJR213 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-18 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ213ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-18 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ213ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Martha Boneta.
Title
Commending Martha Boneta.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-18 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ213ER) |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Received |
2016-02-05 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2016-02-05 | House | Engrossed by House |
2016-02-05 | House | Taken up for immediate consideration |
2016-01-29 | House | Passed by for the day |
2016-01-27 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 16104405D |