VA HJR198 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on February 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ198ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on February 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ198ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending William G. Coada.
Title
Commending William G. Coada.
Sponsors
Del. Delores McQuinn [D] | Del. Bonita Anthony [D] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Baxter Ennis [R] |
Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Lee Ware [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-29 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ198ER) |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Received |
2024-02-26 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2024-02-26 | House | Engrossed by House |
2024-02-20 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 24102105D |
Same As/Similar To
SJR156 (Similar To) 2024-03-04 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ156ER)