VA SJR156 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ156ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ156ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending William G. Coada.
Title
Commending William G. Coada.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ156ER) |
2024-03-04 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2024-03-01 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2024-03-01 | House | Received |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Presented 24106766D |
Same As/Similar To
HJR198 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ198ER)