VA HJR195 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-17 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ195ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-17 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ195ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the Roanoke 100 Miler.
Title
Commending the Roanoke 100 Miler.
Sponsors
Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ195ER) |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Received |
2022-02-14 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2022-02-14 | House | Engrossed by House |
2022-02-04 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 22104627D |