VA HJR191 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on February 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ191ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on February 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ191ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of Lewis Eugene Burke.
Title
Celebrating the life of Lewis Eugene Burke.
Sponsors
Del. Karrie Delaney [D] | Del. Mark Cole [R] | Del. Kathleen Murphy [D] | Del. Ibraheem Samirah [D] |
Del. Shelly Simonds [D] | Del. Lee Ware [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ191ER) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Received |
2020-02-10 | House | Agreed to by House |
2020-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House |
2020-02-05 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 20105465D |