VA HJR174 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-08 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ174ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-08 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ174ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of Elizabeth Harding LeRoy.
Title
Celebrating the life of Elizabeth Harding LeRoy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-08 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ174ER) | |
2010-02-04 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate | |
2010-02-01 | Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk | |
2010-02-01 | Senate: Received | |
2010-01-29 | House: Agreed to by House | |
2010-01-29 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2010-01-22 | House: Introduced bill reprinted 10103964D | |
2010-01-21 | House: Presented and laid on Speaker's table 10103964D |