VA HJR170 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-11-1)
Status: Passed on January 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-29 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ170ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-11-1)
Status: Passed on January 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-29 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ170ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Virginia Task Force 1.
Title
Commending Virginia Task Force 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-29 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ170ER) | |
2010-01-28 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Received | |
2010-01-22 | House: Introduced bill reprinted 10104094D | |
2010-01-22 | House: Agreed to by House by voice vote | |
2010-01-22 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2010-01-20 | House: Presented and laid on Speaker's table 10104094D |