VA HJR17 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-25 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ17ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-25 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ17ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorating the life and legacy of Earle Davis Gregory.
Title
Commemorating the life and legacy of Earle Davis Gregory.
Sponsors
Del. Lee Ware [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ17ER) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2016-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2016-01-18 | Senate | Reading waived |
2016-01-15 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2016-01-15 | House | Engrossed by House |
2015-12-06 | House | Prefiled and laid on Speaker's table; offered 01/13/16 16101433D |