VA HJR142 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-29 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ142ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-29 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ142ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Asian Lunar New Year Day. Designates the day designated as new year on the Asian lunar calendar, in 2012 and in each succeeding year, as Asian Lunar New Year Day in Virginia.
Title
Asian Lunar New Year Day; designates day designated as new year on Asian lunar calendar 2012.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-29 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ142ER) | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Reported from Rules by voice vote | |
2012-02-06 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2012-02-06 | Senate: Reading waived | |
2012-02-03 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-03 | House: Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (94-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-03 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2012-02-03 | House: Taken up | |
2012-01-31 | House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103106D |