VA HJR138 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-23 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ138ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-23 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ138ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Linda J. Byrd.
Title
Commending Linda J. Byrd.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-23 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ138ER) |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Received |
2020-01-20 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2020-01-20 | House | Engrossed by House |
2020-01-13 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 20101720D |