VA HJR129 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on February 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ129ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on February 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ129ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Frances M. Boswell.
Title
Commending Frances M. Boswell.
Sponsors
Del. Hyland Fowler [R] | Del. Nadarius Clark [D] | Del. Mark Earley [R] | Del. Chad Green [R] |
Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] | Del. David Owen [R] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Wendell Walker [R] |
Del. Lee Ware [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ129ER) |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Received |
2024-02-12 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2024-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House |
2024-02-05 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 24104015D |