VA HJR128 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on February 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-29 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ128ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on February 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-29 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ128ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Shaken Baby Syndrome Awareness Week. Designates the third week in April, in 2013 and in each succeeding year, as Shaken Baby Syndrome Awareness Week in Virginia.
Title
Shaken Baby Syndrome Awareness Week; designating third week in April 2013, and each succeeding year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-17 - House - House: Reported from Rules with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-17 - House - House: Reported from Rules with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-29 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ128ER) | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Reported from Rules by voice vote | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Reading waived | |
2012-01-20 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-20 | House: Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-20 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2012-01-20 | House: Committee amendment rejected | |
2012-01-20 | House: Taken up | |
2012-01-17 | House: Reported from Rules with amendment (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102948D |