VA HJR124 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-30 - Left in Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-30 - Left in Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Governor; Virginia's Public Safety Memorial. Requests the Governor to include in the Commonwealth Public Safety Memorial the names of state and local probation and parole officers who have lost their lives in the line of duty.
Title
Public Safety Memorial; requests Governor to include names of state and local parole officers, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-30 | Senate | Left in Rules |
2012-02-24 | Senate | Continued to 2013 in Rules by voice vote |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Reading waived |
2012-02-13 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2012-02-13 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2012-02-13 | House | Engrossed by House |
2012-02-13 | House | Taken up |
2012-02-10 | House | Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) |
2012-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) |
2012-01-18 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: #3 |
2012-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2012-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101474D |