VA HJR120 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 13 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-16 - Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Commending the Jamestown High School Envirothon team.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commending the Jamestown High School Envirothon team.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-16SenateAgreed to by Senate by voice vote
2020-01-14SenateLaid on Clerk's Desk
2020-01-14SenateReceived
2020-01-13HouseAgreed to by House by voice vote
2020-01-13HouseEngrossed by House
2020-01-08HousePrefiled and laid on Speaker's table; offered 01/08/20 20100664D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback