VA HJR120 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-9)
Status: Passed on January 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-23 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ120ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-9)
Status: Passed on January 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-23 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ120ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of the Honorable Nelson Rolihlahla Mandela.
Title
Celebrating the life of the Honorable Nelson Rolihlahla Mandela.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-23 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ120ER) |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Received |
2014-01-17 | House | Agreed to by House |
2014-01-17 | House | Engrossed by House |
2014-01-13 | House | Introduced bill reprinted 14102371D |
2014-01-09 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 14102371D |