VA HJR109 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-27 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ109ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-27 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ109ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Larry J. Shelor.
Title
Commending Larry J. Shelor.
Sponsors
Del. Marie March [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-27 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ109ER) |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Received |
2022-01-24 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2022-01-24 | House | Engrossed by House |
2022-01-17 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 22104094D |