VA HJR1 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-08 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ1ER)
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-08 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ1ER)
Summary
Commending the William Fleming High School boys' basketball team.
Title
Commending the William Fleming High School boys' basketball team
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-08 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ1ER) | |
2008-01-24 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2008-01-21 | Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk | |
2008-01-21 | Senate: Received | |
2008-01-18 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-01-18 | House: Agreed to by House by voice vote | |
2008-01-18 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2008-01-11 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2008-01-07 | House: Introduced bill reprinted 086491538 | |
2007-11-19 | House: Prefiled and laid on Speaker's table; offered 01/09/08 086491538 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HJ1 |