VA HB999 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0510)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0510)
Summary
Bond for abandoned or cruelly treated animals. Allows the court to order the owner of any animal held by a humane investigator or animal control officer for more than 30 days to post a bond with the locality for the amount of the cost of boarding the animal if the locality has not adopted an ordinance requiring the posting of such bond.
Title
Animals; posting of bond by owners of those abandoned or cruelly treated.
Sponsors
Del. Robert Bell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-17 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0510) | |
2008-03-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 510 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-05 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-04 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB999ER) | |
2008-03-04 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-02-29 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-29 | House: Senate substitute agreed to by House 083285432-S1 (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-28 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-27 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-27 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB999S1 | |
2008-02-27 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 083285432-S1 | |
2008-02-27 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-02-27 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-26 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 083285432-S1 | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-29 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources | |
2008-01-29 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-01-28 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-01-28 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-28 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-25 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB999H1 | |
2008-01-25 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 083970432-H1 | |
2008-01-25 | House: Read second time | |
2008-01-24 | House: Read first time | |
2008-01-23 | House: Committee substitute printed 083970432-H1 | |
2008-01-23 | House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-08 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2008-01-08 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 080659432 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB999 |