VA HB998 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Inspection of farm stores. Exempts stores that are owned and operated by a farmer, that are located on the farmer's land, and that sell agricultural products from being inspected by the Virginia Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services. Such stores are limited to selling farm products that are produced on the owner of the store's property and farm products grown on neighboring farms.
Title
Farm stores; exempts stores that are owned and operated by farmer from State inspection.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | House: Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2012-01-30 | House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote | |
2012-01-23 | House: Assigned ACNRsub: Agriculture | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102434D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+sum+HB998 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+HB998+hil |