VA HB997 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0203)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0203)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Eminent domain; application to Norfolk. Extends the expiration date, from June 30, 2010, to December 31, 2010, for the exemption to requirements applicable to the exercise of the power of eminent domain by the City of Norfolk or the Norfolk Redevelopment and Housing Authority. The exemption was created in the 2007 legislation that, among other things, established limitations on what constituted a public use for which private property could be acquired by exercise of the power of eminent domain.
Title
Eminent domain; applicability of requirements to acquisition of property by City of Norfolk, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (89-Y 7-N) (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (34-Y 6-N) (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N) (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (34-Y 6-N) (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N) (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0203) | |
2010-04-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 203 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-08 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-08 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB997ER) | |
2010-03-08 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-02-26 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (89-Y 7-N) | |
2010-02-26 | House: Senate amendment agreed to by House (89-Y 7-N) | |
2010-02-25 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-24 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (34-Y 6-N) | |
2010-02-24 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2010-02-24 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2010-02-24 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2010-02-24 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-02-23 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (14-Y 1-N) | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-10 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N) | |
2010-02-10 | House: Read third time and passed House (95-Y 3-N) | |
2010-02-09 | House: Engrossed by House - floor substitute HB997H1 | |
2010-02-09 | House: Substitute by Delegate Howell, A.T. agreed to 10105142D-H1 | |
2010-02-09 | House: Floor substitute printed 10105142D-H1 (Howell, A.T.) | |
2010-02-09 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-08 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-03 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 3-N) | |
2010-01-25 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-19 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2010-01-13 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-01-13 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103757D |