VA HB996 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0529)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0529)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Minority Business Enterprise; electronic certification process. Authorizes the Department of Minority Business Enterprise to accept applications for certification as a small, women-owned, or minority-owned business through electronic means.
Title
Minority Business Enterprise, Department of; authorizes electronic certification process.
Sponsors
Del. Barbara Comstock [R] | Del. Anne Crockett-Stark [R] | Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] | Del. Margaret Ransone [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Science and Technology (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Science and Technology (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0529) | |
2012-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 529 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-02-29 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-02-29 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB996ER) | |
2012-02-29 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-22 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-20 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-31 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2012-01-31 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-01-30 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-30 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-27 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-01-26 | House: Read first time | |
2012-01-25 | House: Reported from Science and Technology (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Science and Technology | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103758D |