VA HB992 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Commonwealth Transportation Board; statewide plan. Directs the Commonwealth Transportation Board to develop a statewide plan for the allocation of certain funds from the federal Infrastructure Investment and Jobs Act and to identify projects that can be funded through competitive grants through the Act. The bill requires the Board to conduct a risk-based assessment of vulnerabilities of transportation assets and systems in the Commonwealth to weather events and natural disasters.
Title
Commonwealth Transportation Board; Board to develop statewide plan.
Sponsors
Del. Kathy Tran [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 3-N) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Transportation |
2022-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 3-N) |
2022-01-20 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2 Transportation Infrastructure and Funding |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100896D |