VA HB991 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0311)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0311)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Illegal gambling; exemptions. Exempts from the provisions of Code prohibiting illegal gambling the placement or operation of or communication to and from data center equipment in the Commonwealth associated with the hosting of lottery games duly authorized by another state or jurisdiction and regulated and operated consistent with and exclusively for the benefit of such state or jurisdiction, provided that wagering on such games is legally authorized in such other state or jurisdiction and the individuals wagering on such games are required by the laws or regulations of such other state or jurisdiction to be physically located within the geographic bounds of such other state or jurisdiction at the time the wager is initiated or placed.
Title
Gambling data; use of Cloud Technology.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (88-Y 8-N) (Y: 88 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (94-Y 6-N) (Y: 94 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (94-Y 6-N) (Y: 94 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0311) | |
2024-04-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 311 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-04 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-04 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB991ER) |
2024-03-04 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-27 | House | VOTE: Adoption (88-Y 8-N) |
2024-02-27 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (88-Y 8-N) |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-02 | House | VOTE: Passage (94-Y 6-N) |
2024-02-02 | House | Read third time and passed House (94-Y 6-N) |
2024-02-01 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2024-01-29 | House | Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation (21-Y 1-N) |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Communications, Technology and Innovation |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24102505D |
Same As/Similar To
SB540 (Similar To) 2024-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0358)